Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1611 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#725 | Journal Page: 2062 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2062 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 2060 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2060 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#615 | Journal Page: 1936 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1938 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#615 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1937 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 610 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 610 | |
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |