Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2429 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/31/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 10 2025 3:58PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee