Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1291 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Amended | 1-Wilson | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1185 | Journal Page: 2546 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1185 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Wilson | Journal Page: 2546 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Wilson | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |