House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1328 | Journal Page: 2710 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2710 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2710 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1231 | Journal Page: 2599 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2599 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1231 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Kitzman | Journal Page: 2599 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Kitzman | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1836 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 620 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 620 | |
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed |