Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2558 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2025
Fiscal Note February 7, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 16, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 21, 2025