Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2091 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#759 | Journal Page: 2089 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2089 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2090 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#759 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1991 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#670 | Journal Page: 1987 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#670 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1990 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 621 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 621 | |
House | 02/07/2025 | Filed |