Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1687 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#403 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1625 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#353 | Journal Page: 1633 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#353 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1625 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 02/07/2025 | Filed |