Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#374 | Journal Page: 1655 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#320 | Journal Page: 1604 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1604 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#320 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Hull and Oliverson | Journal Page: 1595 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#319 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Hull | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 435 | |
House | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |