House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | 5/5/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2577 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed 5/5/ 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 636 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 636 | |
House | 02/10/2025 | Filed |