Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2094 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#769 | Journal Page: 2093 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2015 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#692 | Journal Page: 2010 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#692 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 2-Zwiener | Journal Page: 2008 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#691 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended 2-Zwiener | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#690 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended 1-Zwiener | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 637 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 637 | |
House | 02/10/2025 | Filed |