Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2065 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#728 | Journal Page: 2065 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2065 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2065 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#621 | Journal Page: 1941 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 2-Hull | Journal Page: 1941 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 637 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 637 | |
House | 02/10/2025 | Filed |