House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2227
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1194
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 637
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 637
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|