Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2684 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/21/2025 12:00 pm
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:14PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
04/21/2025 12:00 pm
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:14PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/21/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House