House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1321 | Journal Page: 2702 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2702 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2702 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1221 | Journal Page: 2586 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1221 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 644 | |
House | 02/12/2025 | Filed |