Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading as amended
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading as amended
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar