LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2797
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2797
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2797
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/27/2025
8:00 am
Land & Resource Management Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
HB24
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Postponed
HB2015
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2149
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2559
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB2701
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
HB2797
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3172
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee