Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1512 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1902 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#586 | Journal Page: 1901 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1901 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1901 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#548 | Journal Page: 1830 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1818 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) | Journal Page: 1818 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#548 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Capriglione | Journal Page: 1817 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#547 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Capriglione | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment amended | 2-Capriglione | Journal Page: 1828 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#546 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Capriglione | Journal Page: 1819 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment amended 2-Capriglione | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1827 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 1-Capriglione | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1041 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Filed |