House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1323 | Journal Page: 2704 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2704 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2704 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1223 | Journal Page: 2588 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2588 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2588 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1837 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 663 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 663 | |
House | 02/13/2025 | Filed |