LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB295
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB295
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB295
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/03/2025
8:00 am
S/C on Academic & Career-Oriented Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.030
HB295
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB824
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1579
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Received from the House
HB1581
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2189
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 6:41PM