Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1487 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#496 | Journal Page: 1778 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1778 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#496 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1778 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#459 | Journal Page: 1735 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#459 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#458 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Amended | 1-Schofield | Journal Page: 1734 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1725 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Amended 1-Schofield | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 02/18/2025 | Filed |