Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2994 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R5361 AND-D
 By: Guillen H.B. No. 2994




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report by the Health and Human Services Commission on
 Medicaid eligibility determinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "commission" means the
 Health and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  The commission shall prepare a written report on the
 time frames within which Medicaid eligibility determinations were
 made based on Medicaid applications submitted to the commission
 each state fiscal year beginning with the state fiscal year ending
 August 31, 2018. The report must include:
 (1)  for each state fiscal year covered by the report:
 (A)  the total number of Medicaid applications
 submitted to the commission;
 (B)  the total number of Medicaid applications the
 commission approved in accordance with the time frames described by
 1 T.A.C. Section 358.530(a);
 (C)  the total number of Medicaid applications the
 commission denied in accordance with the time frames described by 1
 T.A.C. Section 358.530(a) and the reason for each denial;
 (D)  the total number of Medicaid applications the
 commission approved in a time frame that exceeded the time frames
 described by 1 T.A.C. Section 358.530(a);
 (E)  the total number of Medicaid applications the
 commission denied because the eligibility determination was not
 made in accordance with the time frames described by 1 T.A.C.
 Section 358.530(a);
 (F)  the average number of days between the date a
 Medicaid application was submitted to the commission and the date
 the application was approved or denied; and
 (G)  the median number of days between the date a
 Medicaid application was submitted to the commission and the date
 the application was approved or denied;
 (2)  the total number of Medicaid applications
 submitted to the commission that are pending on the date the report
 required by this subsection is prepared and, for each of those
 applications, the number of days that have elapsed between the date
 the application was submitted and the date the report is prepared;
 and
 (3)  the highest number of days that elapsed between
 the date a Medicaid application was submitted to the commission in
 any state fiscal year and the date the application was approved or
 denied.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2026, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of
 the house of representatives, and legislature the written report
 the commission prepares under Subsection (b) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires December 31, 2026.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.