Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2996 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/08/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:27PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee