1 | 1 | | 89R8888 JDK-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Canales H.B. No. 3006 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the purchase and installation of climate control |
---|
10 | 10 | | systems at facilities operated by the Texas Department of Criminal |
---|
11 | 11 | | Justice. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) "Department" means the Texas Department of |
---|
15 | 15 | | Criminal Justice. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) "Required temperature-controlled area" means the |
---|
17 | 17 | | following areas of a facility operated by the department: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (A) hospitals; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (B) visiting areas; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (C) housing or dormitory areas; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (D) trustee areas; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (E) areas used for medical treatment or care, |
---|
23 | 23 | | including areas used for dispensing medication to inmates; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (F) kitchens or dining areas; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (G) food preparation areas; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (H) community areas, including dayrooms; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (I) laundry areas; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (J) areas used for work stations; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (K) indoor recreational areas, including |
---|
30 | 30 | | gymnasiums; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (L) restroom and shower areas and other areas |
---|
32 | 32 | | related to inmate hygiene; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (M) administrative areas; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (N) correctional officer stations, including |
---|
35 | 35 | | guard post areas; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (O) commissary areas; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (P) areas used for programmatic, educational, or |
---|
38 | 38 | | vocational purposes; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (Q) chapels or churches; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (R) libraries; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (S) maintenance areas. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (b) The department shall: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) contract with a private entity through a |
---|
44 | 44 | | competitive bidding process to purchase and install climate control |
---|
45 | 45 | | systems at each facility operated by the department that is not |
---|
46 | 46 | | currently equipped with a climate control system capable of |
---|
47 | 47 | | maintaining the temperature in the required temperature-controlled |
---|
48 | 48 | | areas of the facility at not less than 65 degrees Fahrenheit or more |
---|
49 | 49 | | than 85 degrees Fahrenheit; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) install the climate control systems in the |
---|
51 | 51 | | following phases, with each phase consisting of the installation of |
---|
52 | 52 | | climate control systems at approximately one-third of the |
---|
53 | 53 | | department's facilities at a cost not to exceed $100 million per |
---|
54 | 54 | | phase: |
---|
55 | 55 | | (A) phase one to be completed not later than |
---|
56 | 56 | | December 31, 2028; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (B) phase two to be completed not later than |
---|
58 | 58 | | December 31, 2030; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (C) phase three to be completed not later than |
---|
60 | 60 | | December 31, 2032. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (c) In conducting the competitive bidding process, the |
---|
62 | 62 | | department shall solicit bids for the entire scope of the project, |
---|
63 | 63 | | provided that the department may solicit bids for each phase of the |
---|
64 | 64 | | project if necessary or beneficial. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (d) In soliciting bids and determining the requirements for |
---|
66 | 66 | | the phased implementation of the project, the department shall: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) prioritize the efficient use of state resources; |
---|
68 | 68 | | and |
---|
69 | 69 | | (2) consider factors such as: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (A) the type of climate control systems needed |
---|
71 | 71 | | for each facility, including the architectural design of each |
---|
72 | 72 | | facility; |
---|
73 | 73 | | (B) the ability of any existing climate control |
---|
74 | 74 | | systems in each facility to maintain the air temperature in the |
---|
75 | 75 | | required temperature-controlled areas of the facility at not less |
---|
76 | 76 | | than 65 degrees Fahrenheit or more than 85 degrees Fahrenheit; |
---|
77 | 77 | | (C) the comparable abilities of different |
---|
78 | 78 | | climate control systems to maintain the temperature described by |
---|
79 | 79 | | Paragraph (B) of this subdivision, including the total cellblock or |
---|
80 | 80 | | dormitory square footage each system is capable of maintaining at |
---|
81 | 81 | | that temperature; and |
---|
82 | 82 | | (D) the use of inmate labor to decrease costs. |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 2. This Act expires January 1, 2035. |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 3. (a) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice is |
---|
85 | 85 | | required to implement a provision of this Act only if: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (1) the legislature allocates available federal funds |
---|
87 | 87 | | specifically for that purpose; or |
---|
88 | 88 | | (2) the legislature specifically appropriates state |
---|
89 | 89 | | funds to the department for the purpose of implementing a provision |
---|
90 | 90 | | of this Act. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (a)(2) of this section, |
---|
92 | 92 | | the Texas Department of Criminal Justice may not implement a |
---|
93 | 93 | | provision of this Act using state funds. |
---|
94 | 94 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
95 | 95 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
96 | 96 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
97 | 97 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
98 | 98 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|