House | 04/28/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1969 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1809 | Journal Page: 1968 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 691 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 691 | |
House | 02/19/2025 | Filed |