Senate | 05/08/2025 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3148 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1637 | Journal Page: 3147 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 3147 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3147 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3063 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1566 | Journal Page: 3023 |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3023 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3023 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2504 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 02/19/2025 | Filed |