Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1136 | Journal Page: 2491 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2491 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2491 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1095 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2430 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 1-Paul | Journal Page: 2430 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2430 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1740 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 02/19/2025 | Filed |