Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB310 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/12/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/12/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars