Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3126 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Darby, Lambert, Metcalf, Guillen H.B. No. 3126
2-
3-
1+By: Darby, Lambert, Metcalf H.B. No. 3126
42
53
64 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
75 AN ACT
8- relating to the election of certain school districts and
9- open-enrollment charter schools to participate in the uniform group
10- coverage program for active school employees.
6+ relating to the election of certain school districts to participate
7+ in the uniform group coverage program for active school employees.
118 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
129 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1579, Insurance Code, is
1310 amended by adding Section 1579.1551 to read as follows:
14- Sec. 1579.1551. SMALL SCHOOL DISTRICT AND CHARTER SCHOOL
15- PROGRAM PARTICIPATION. (a) This section applies to a school
16- district or open-enrollment charter school that discontinued
17- participation in the program effective on September 1, 2022, in
18- accordance with Section 1579.155(a).
11+ Sec. 1579.1551. SMALL SCHOOL DISTRICT PROGRAM
12+ PARTICIPATION. (a) This section applies to a school district that:
13+ (1) discontinued participation in the program
14+ effective on September 1, 2022, in accordance with Section
15+ 1579.155(a); and
16+ (2) at the time the district elects to participate in
17+ the program under this section, has 500 or fewer employees.
1918 (b) Notwithstanding Section 1579.155(b), a school district
20- or charter school to which this section applies may elect to
21- participate in the program before the fifth anniversary of the
22- effective date of the district's or school's election to
23- discontinue participation in the program if the district or school:
19+ to which this section applies may elect to participate in the
20+ program before the fifth anniversary of the effective date of the
21+ district's election to discontinue participation in the program if
22+ the district:
2423 (1) provides written notice to the trustee not later
25- than December 31, 2025, of the district's or school's election to
26- participate in the program effective beginning September 1, 2026;
27- and
24+ than December 31, 2025, of the district's election to participate
25+ in the program effective beginning September 1, 2026; and
2826 (2) complies with any other requirements established
2927 by the trustee for program participation.
3028 (c) For the plan year beginning September 1, 2026, the
3129 trustee shall impose a risk stabilization fee in an amount
32- determined by the trustee on the premiums of a school district or
33- charter school to which this section applies.
34- (d) A school district or charter school that elects to
35- participate in the program in accordance with this section may not
36- elect to discontinue participation until September 1, 2031.
30+ determined by the trustee on the premiums of a school district to
31+ which this section applies.
32+ (d) A school district that elects to participate in the
33+ program in accordance with this section may not elect to
34+ discontinue participation until September 1, 2031.
3735 (e) The trustee by rule may impose additional requirements,
38- conditions, and deadlines with which a school district or charter
39- school to which this section applies must comply to elect to
40- participate in the program in accordance with this section.
36+ conditions, and deadlines with which a school district to which
37+ this section applies must comply to elect to participate in the
38+ program in accordance with this section.
4139 (f) This section expires September 1, 2031.
4240 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.