Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3131 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/20/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R6198 ANG-D
 By: Bhojani H.B. No. 3131




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Public Utility Commission of Texas of the
 effects that current laws, rules, and regulations of this state and
 its political subdivisions regarding pole attachments have on the
 expansion of broadband service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Public Utility Commission
 of Texas.
 (2)  "Electric cooperative" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 181.048, Utilities Code.
 (3)  "Pole" has the meaning assigned by Section
 252.001, Utilities Code.
 (4)  "Pole attachment" means an affixture of cables,
 strands, wires, and associated equipment attached to a pole
 directly or indirectly for the provision of broadband service.
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with the Texas
 Broadband Development Office, shall conduct a study of current
 laws, rules, and regulations of this state and its political
 subdivisions related to pole attachments to determine the effects
 those laws, rules, and regulations have on broadband service
 expansion.  The study must include an evaluation of:
 (1)  the average time for the preparation and placement
 of a pole attachment, including:
 (A)  the time it takes for an electric cooperative
 or an electric cooperative's affiliate to approve a new pole
 attachment requested by a broadband provider; and
 (B)  ways to decrease or standardize the time it
 takes for the completion of a new pole attachment;
 (2)  the effectiveness of laws, rules, or regulations
 regarding the timely relocation or removal of:
 (A)  poles that are functionally obsolete;
 (B)  poles that violate the Americans with
 Disabilities Act of 1990 (42 U.S.C. Section 12101 et seq.); and
 (C)  poles that obstruct current or future
 municipal infrastructure; and
 (3)  the commission's current resources to educate
 broadband providers, electric cooperatives, and electric
 cooperative affiliates regarding the right to install a pole
 attachment.
 (c)  Not later than February 15, 2026, the commission shall
 submit an initial report regarding the results of the study
 conducted under Subsection (b) of this section to each legislative
 standing committee with jurisdiction over issues regarding
 broadband services.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2026, the commission shall
 submit a final report regarding the results of the study conducted
 under Subsection (b) of this section to each legislative standing
 committee with jurisdiction over issues regarding broadband
 services.
 (e)  This Act expires December 31, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.