Senate | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#404 | Journal Page: 1688 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1627 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#354 | Journal Page: 1634 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#354 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1634 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1634 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 02/21/2025 | Filed |