House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | No action taken in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Filed |