House | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1656 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 709 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 709 | |
House | 02/24/2025 | Filed |