Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 21, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Fiscal Note April 21, 2025
Bill April 21, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 25, 2025