Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#764 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#681 | Journal Page: 2002 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 1-K. Bell | Journal Page: 2001 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended 1-K. Bell | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker | Journal Page: 712 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Filed |