Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3278 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/25/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R13084 ANG-D
 By: McLaughlin H.B. No. 3278




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the study of and incentives for the use of solar and
 wind energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY ON SOLAR AND WIND ENERGY AND RELATED
 FACILITIES. (a)  In this Act, "commission" means the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality.
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with the Public Utility
 Commission of Texas, the Parks and Wildlife Department, and any
 other relevant state agency, shall conduct a study on the effects of
 solar generation facilities and wind generation facilities on the
 environment, the economy, and infrastructure in this state.
 (c)  In conducting the study, the commission shall examine:
 (1)  land use and habitat disruption, including the
 impact of large solar and wind generation facilities on
 agricultural land, native ecosystems, and wildlife habitats;
 (2)  decommissioning and disposal challenges related
 to solar and wind generation facilities, including a consideration
 of the life cycle of solar panels and wind turbines, hazardous waste
 risks, sustainability of recycling methods, and the disposal of
 components;
 (3)  grid reliability and energy security, including
 any effects of an increased reliance on solar and wind energy on
 electric grid stability, energy storage needs, and grid reliability
 during periods of peak demand;
 (4)  the economic impact of solar and wind generation
 facilities on rural communities, including changes in land value,
 tax revenue, or agricultural productivity in areas where solar
 generation facilities or wind generation facilities are
 established;
 (5)  potential fire risks associated with lithium-ion
 battery storage and the capability of rural emergency services to
 effectively respond to a fire at a battery facility;
 (6)  risks of soil and water contamination from solar
 generation facilities, including risks associated with water
 usage, long-term soil degradation, and the disposal of solar panel
 materials;
 (7)  wildlife and avian mortality related to the
 production of wind energy, including the effects of wind turbines
 on migratory birds, bats, and other wildlife populations; and
 (8)  the noise created by and potential health effects
 of wind generation facilities, including the potential effects of
 wind turbine noise, infrasound, and shadow flicker on nearby
 communities.
 (d)  The commission shall hold public hearings in rural
 counties and counties in which solar or wind generation facilities
 are located to collect input relevant to the study from landowners,
 energy industry representatives, environmental experts, and local
 officials.
 (e)  Not later than September 1, 2026, the commission shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the chair of the standing committee
 of each house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over
 energy production an interim report that includes the initial
 results of the study conducted under this section.
 (f)  Not later than January 31, 2027, the commission shall
 submit a final report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the chair of the
 standing committee of each house of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over energy production a written report that includes
 the results of the study conducted under this section and any
 recommendations for the legislature.
 (g)  The commission shall begin the interim study required by
 this section not later than September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  MORATORIUM ON STATE ECONOMIC INCENTIVES. (a)
 Notwithstanding any other law and except as otherwise provided by
 this section, during the period that begins on the effective date of
 this Act and ends on the last day of the 90th Legislature, Regular
 Session, a solar energy project, wind energy project, solar
 generation facility, or wind generation facility is not eligible to
 receive a state economic incentive, including a state tax
 incentive.
 (b)  Subsection (a) of this section does not apply to a state
 economic incentive the application for which was submitted on or
 before the effective date of this Act.
 (c)  The members of the 90th Legislature, Regular Session, by
 adoption of a concurrent resolution approved by a record vote of a
 majority of the members of each house of the legislature may
 terminate the moratorium imposed under Subsection (a) of this
 section before the date the moratorium would otherwise expire under
 that subsection.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2025.