Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3281 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/22/2025 2:00 pm
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/22/2025 2:00 pm
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted