Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB329 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/03/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)