House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/21/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 02/25/2025 | Filed |