House | 05/02/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 792 | |
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/21/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 02/25/2025 | Filed |