Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3320 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 3:53PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:57PM