House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 03/21/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 720 | |
House | 02/26/2025 | Filed |