Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3362 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 3:40PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/15/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 3:40PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule