House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered by s/c in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to s/c on Property Tax Appraisals by Speaker | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 03/21/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 02/26/2025 | Filed |