LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB3415
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3415
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3415
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/31/2025
8:00 am
Public Health Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.030
HB3000
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:47PM
HB2622
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB2283
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB541
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1776
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1803
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1669
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2588
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB220
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB3415
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB50
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB1314
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
HB107
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services