House | 05/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 726 | |
House | 02/26/2025 | Filed |