89R12960 JSC-D By: Hernandez H.B. No. 3494 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to wages paid to certain workers with disabilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Effective September 1, 2030, Section 62.051, Labor Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 62.051. MINIMUM WAGE. An [Except as provided by Section 62.057, an] employer shall pay to each employee the federal minimum wage under Section 6, Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (29 U.S.C. Section 206). SECTION 2. Section 62.057, Labor Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) This section expires September 1, 2030. SECTION 3. Section 62.161, Labor Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 62.161. SHELTERED WORKSHOPS. (a) A nonprofit charitable organization that is engaged in evaluating, training, and employment services for clients with disabilities and that complies with federal regulations covering those activities is considered to have complied with this chapter. (b) This section expires September 1, 2030. SECTION 4. Chapter 62, Labor Code, is amended by adding Subchapter F to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER F. MINIMUM WAGE PLAN FOR WORKERS WITH DISABILITIES Sec. 62.251. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies to an employer who pays workers with disabilities wages that are less than the federal minimum wage under Section 6, Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (29 U.S.C. Section 206). Sec. 62.252. WORKFORCE COMMISSION ASSISTANCE. The workforce commission shall assist: (1) an employer in developing a plan to increase the wages paid to its workers with disabilities to the federal minimum wage not later than September 1, 2030; and (2) an employer by providing: (A) information about certified benefits counselors to ensure that workers are informed about work incentives and the potential impact the increase in wages may have on a worker's eligibility for any federal or state benefit program; and (B) a referral to a certified benefits counselor to any worker with a disability who requests a referral. Sec. 62.253. EMPLOYER RETENTION OF WORKERS. (a) Each employer shall, to the maximum extent possible, ensure that each worker with a disability remains employed by the employer after the employer increases the wages paid to those workers to at least the federal minimum wage. (b) If an employer is unable to employ all workers with a disability after the employer increases the wages paid to those employees to the federal minimum wage, the employer shall work with the commission and any other governmental entity to seek and obtain any job training and employment services that may be suitable for those former employees to find other employment that pays at least the federal minimum wage. Sec. 62.254. WORKER ASSISTANCE BY COMMISSION. In addition to the assistance described by Section 62.253(b), the commission may, at the worker's request, assist a worker with a disability not retained by an employer to secure employment in a position that pays at least the federal minimum wage. Sec. 62.255. EXTENSION. (a) On request of an employer, the commission may extend the period for compliance with the minimum wage requirements of this chapter for not more than 12 months if the employer: (1) requests the extension not later than March 1, 2030; (2) has demonstrated to the commission that an extension would be in the best interest of the employer's current workers with disabilities; and (3) has worked with the commission to develop a transition plan for the payment of at least the federal minimum wage to workers with disabilities. (b) The commission shall make a decision on a request for an extension under Subsection (a) not later than May 1, 2030. (c) The commission may not grant more than one extension to an employer. Sec. 62.256. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires September 1, 2031. SECTION 5. Effective September 1, 2030, Section 201.067(b), Labor Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), in this subtitle "employment" includes service performed by an individual whose earning capacity is impaired by age, physical impairment, developmental disability, mental illness, or intellectual disability or injury[, other than an individual compensated as provided by Section 62.057,] and who, after training, is working for a sheltered workshop or other facility operated by a charitable organization: (1) temporarily while awaiting placement in a position of employment in the competitive labor market; or (2) permanently because the individual is unable to compete in the competitive labor market. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.