Senate | 05/07/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1786 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2906 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1454 | Journal Page: 2905 |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2905 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2905 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2838 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Amended | 1-Harris | Journal Page: 2837 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2837 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Amended 1-Harris | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 736 | |
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 736 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Filed |