House | 04/25/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Filed |