House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed | 5/5/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2192 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2192 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 738 | |
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 738 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Filed |