Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1129 | Journal Page: 2486 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1088 | Journal Page: 2403 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2402 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1088 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 345 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |